Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paulo Celso Dias do Nascimento

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Aguntum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1963 Born
13 May 198926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
2012²48.7IncardinatedPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Oct 201754.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Oct 201754.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aguntum
6 Jan 201854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aguntum

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulo Celso Dias do Nascimento
Father Paulo Celso Dias do Nascimento (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagarto, Diocese of Estância, Sergipe
Ordained PriestSantuário Nossa Senhora da Piedade, Church, Lagarto, Diocese of Estância, Sergipe
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2017
  • ob: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Oct 2017