Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dulcênio Fontes de Matos

Bishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1958 Born
14 Dec 198527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
18 Apr 200142.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
18 Apr 200142.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cozyla
16 Jun 200142.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cozyla
12 Jul 200647.7AppointedBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
11 Oct 201758.9AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
2 Dec 201759.1InstalledBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Dulcênio Fontes de Matos
Bishop Dulcênio Fontes de Matos (born ) Bishop of Campina Grande

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagarto
Ordained BishopPraça Barão do Rio Branco, in front of, Cathedral, Estância, Diocese of Estância, Sergipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campina Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,993
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2017
  • i: CB, 2 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2018