Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Palmeira Lessa

Archbishop Emeritus of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1942 Born
3 Jul 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 198240.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
21 Jun 198240.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
24 Aug 198240.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
30 Oct 198745.7AppointedBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
6 Dec 199654.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
26 Aug 199856.6SucceededArchbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
18 Jan 201775.0RetiredArchbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Palmeira Lessa
Archbishop José Palmeira Lessa (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aracajú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoruripe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Aracajú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jan 2017