Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto dos Santos

Bishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1955 Born
21 May 198327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
15 Jun 200549.7AppointedBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
26 Jul 200549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
1 Feb 201761.3AppointedBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto dos Santos
Bishop Carlos Alberto dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Itabuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTobias Barreto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itabuna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,950
  • ab: CB, 1 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Feb 2017