Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Maria Messi, O.S.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1934 BornRecanati
1 Apr 195621.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
7 Apr 195823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Jun 198853.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
15 Jun 198853.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zucchabar
14 Aug 198853.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zucchabar
22 Mar 199560.5AppointedBishop of Irecê, Baia, Brazil
17 Nov 199965.1AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
8 Jun 201176.7RetiredBishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Maria Messi:
Bishop João Maria Messi O.S.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013