Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Haring, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1940 Born
22 Jul 196726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jan 200059.0AppointedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
20 Mar 200059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
10 May 201776.3RetiredBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Haring
Bishop José Haring O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGronau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limoeiro do Norte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,739
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 May 2017