Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinho Lammers, O.F.M.

Prelate Emeritus of Óbidos, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1939 BornNienborg, Germany
22 Jul 196727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jul 197636.6AppointedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
2 Aug 197939.6AppointedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
4 Oct 197939.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
28 Jan 200969.1ResignedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Martinho Lammers:
Bishop Martinho Lammers O.F.M. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Óbidos

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Óbidos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013