Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Johannes Bahlmann, O.F.M.

Bishop of Óbidos, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1960 BornVisbek, Germany
4 Oct 199130.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 199736.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jan 200948.1AppointedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
9 May 200948.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
23 May 200948.5InstalledPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
9 Nov 201150.9AppointedBishop of Óbidos, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Johannes Bahlmann:
Bishop Bernardo Johannes Bahlmann O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Óbidos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Óbidos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,170
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013