Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Timmerevers

Bishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1952 BornGarrel Nikolausdorf
25 May 198027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
6 Jul 200148.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
6 Jul 200148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
2 Sep 200149.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana
29 Apr 201663.6AppointedBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Timmerevers
Bishop Heinrich Timmerevers (born ) Bishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,038
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Apr 2016