Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo Ulrich Steiner, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1950 Born
20 Jan 197221.2EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Aug 197625.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Jan 197827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 200554.2AppointedPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
16 Apr 200554.4Ordained BishopPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
21 Sep 201160.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
21 Sep 201160.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
27 Nov 201969.0AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
31 Jan 202069.2InstalledArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Ulrich Steiner
Archbishop Leonardo Ulrich Steiner O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Manaus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForquilhinha
Ordained BishopSão Paulo Apóstolo, Cathedral, Blumenau, Diocese of Blumenau, Santa Catarina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Manaus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,852
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2019
  • ln: CB, 27 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 May 2020

Quantcast