Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
31 Aug 1973 | Born | ||
14 Mar 1999 | 25.5 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil |
12 Oct 1999 | 26.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil |
8 Nov 2023 | 50.1 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil |
8 Nov 2023 | 50.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Macri |
2 Feb 2024 | 50.4 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Macri |
Father
Joaquim Hudson
de Souza Ribeiro
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Manaus
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Parintins, Territorial Prelature of Parintins, Amazonas |
Ordained Bishop | São José Operário, Shrine |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 23 Nov 2023 |
✠