Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Parintins

Dioecesis Parintinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuliano Frigeni, P.I.M.E., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 30 October 1980
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Manaus
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Amazonas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 75,654 (29,221 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 01, Av. Leopoldo Neves 516, 69151-000 Parintins, AM, Brazil
  • Telephone: (092) 533-1742

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Parintins
12 July 1955ErectedArchdiocese of Manaus Territorial Prelature of Parintins (erected)
13 July 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus
Territorial Prelature of Parintins
Territorial Prelature of Borba (erected)
Diocese of Parintins
30 October 1980ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Parintins Diocese of Parintins

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Parintins
196572,00075,00096.0%16164,500107ap1967
197088,00090,00097.8%18184,88820165ap1971
1976107,000110,00097.3%115166,68717207ap1977
1980113,000116,00097.4%116176,64719208ap1981
Diocese of Parintins
1990144,000150,00096.0%412169,00018158ap1991
1999163,000172,00094.8%416208,150192032ap2000
2000166,000175,02094.8%617237,21719248ap2001
2001173,000182,68194.7%716237,52119248ap2002
2002170,000193,60087.8%715227,72718268ap2003
2003170,000195,50087.0%715227,72718268ap2004
2004170,000195,60086.9%815237,39118269ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 12 Jul 2012