Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano Frigeni, P.I.M.E.

Bishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1947 Born
10 May 197527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
20 Jan 199951.5AppointedBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Mar 199951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Frigeni
Bishop Giuliano Frigeni P.I.M.E. (born ) Bishop of Parintins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parintins.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017