Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Santoro

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1948 BornCarbonara, Italy
20 May 197223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
10 Apr 199647.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Apr 199647.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
29 Jun 199648.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
12 May 200455.8AppointedBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jun 200455.9InstalledBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
21 Nov 201163.4AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
5 Jan 201263.5InstalledArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Santoro:
Archbishop Filippo Santoro (born ) Archbishop of Taranto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taranto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,764
  • b/ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 23 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013