Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Josef Romer

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Titular Bishop of Columnata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1932 BornBenken, Switzerland
22 Mar 195825.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 197543.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Oct 197543.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Columnata
12 Dec 197543.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Columnata
13 Apr 200269.8AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
10 Nov 200775.3RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Karl Josef Romer:
Bishop Karl Josef Romer (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Family

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for the Family.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013