Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Corso, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campos, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1928BornCajobí
30 Aug 195325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Oct 199062.5AppointedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
8 Dec 199062.7Ordained BishopBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Nov 199567.6ResignedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Oct 201486.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Corso:
Bishop João Corso S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campos

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,294
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 16 Oct 2014