Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joel Portella Amado

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Carmeiano (Cameiano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1954 Born
12 Oct 198228.0Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Dec 201662.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Dec 201662.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carmeiano (Cameiano)
28 Jan 201762.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carmeiano (Cameiano)

MicroData Summary for Joel Portella Amado
Bishop Joel Portella Amado (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Dec 2016
  • c34: CB, 28 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018