Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Assis Lopes

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Zaraï


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1934 BornRio de Janeiro
3 Jul 196833.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Jan 200368.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Jan 200368.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
19 Mar 200368.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraï
26 Jan 201176.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Assis Lopes:
Bishop Assis Lopes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013