Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Alves Romão

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1964 Born
28 Jun 199733.2Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Dec 201652.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Dec 201652.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
28 Jan 201752.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama

MicroData Summary for Paulo Alves Romão
Bishop Paulo Alves Romão (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarra do Jacaré, Diocese of Jacarezinho, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Dec 2016
  • c34: CB, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017