Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Petrópolis

Dioecesis Petropolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 13 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Niterói
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio de Janeiro
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 3,075 (1,187 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste I
  • Mailing Address: Rua Sao Pedro de Alcantara 12, 25685-300 Petropolis, RJ, Brazil
  • Telephone: (024) 242-2638
  • Fax: 237-2632

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
13 April 1946ErectedDiocese of Barra do Piraí
Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy; Petrópolis)
Diocese of Petrópolis (erected)
26 March 1960Territory LostDiocese of Barra do Piraí
Diocese of Petrópolis
Diocese of Nova Friburgo (erected)
15 February 1964Territory LostDiocese of Pesqueira
Diocese of Petrópolis
Diocese of Floresta (erected)
11 October 1980Territory LostDiocese of Nova Iguaçu
Diocese of Petrópolis
Diocese of Duque de Caxias (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949250,000270,00092.6%1541564,46411529021ap1951
1966650,000700,00092.9%2953827,92614437030ap1967
1970760,000800,00095.0%3068987,75514837833ap1971
1976900,0001,000,00090.0%41651068,49022530035ap1977
1980967,0001,140,00084.8%38721108,79023030035ap1981
1990682,000815,00083.7%3939788,7439532931ap1991
1999799,000938,00085.2%4539849,5117721133ap2000
2000580,000690,00084.1%4837856,8239833534ap2001
2001580,000690,00084.1%53471005,80012731634ap2002
2002572,000722,00079.2%5440946,08511931435ap2003
2003595,000760,00078.3%57521095,45813732236ap2004
2004595,000760,00078.3%62511135,26513632537ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 10 Oct 2012