Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos de Lima Vaz, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1928BornOuro Preto
15 Jul 195728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 198658.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Dec 198658.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
7 Mar 198758.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
15 Nov 199567.2AppointedBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 May 200475.7RetiredBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 Jul 200879.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos de Lima Vaz:
Bishop José Carlos de Lima Vaz S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015