Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte

Archidioecesis Bellohorizontina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 February 1924
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 7,222 (2,789 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste 2
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesebh.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropoitana, Av. Brasil 2079, 30140-008 Belo Horizonte, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (031)3269-3100
  • Fax: 3269-3178

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Belo Horizonte
11 February 1921ErectedArchdiocese of Mariana Diocese of Belo Horizonte (erected)
Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
1 February 1924ElevatedDiocese of Belo Horizonte Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
20 December 1941Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Oliveira, Carino de Mata, Japão, São Francisco de Paula, Boni Successo, Sauf Jago, Passa Tempo, S. João Batista, Santo Antonio do Amparo, Campo Bello, Sant'Anna do Joceré, Cristeis, Candeias, Cana Verde, Perdões, and Riberão Vermelho) Diocese of Oliveira (erected)
16 July 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Santo Antonio, Sant'Ana, Baldim, Fortuna, Inhaúma, Jaboticatubas, Jequitibá, Maravilhas, Martinho Campos, Matosinhos, Papagaio, Pequi, Pompéu, and Prudente de Moráis)
Archdiocese of Diamantina (Cedro, Lagoa Bonita, Paraopeba, Pirapama, and Biacho Fundo)
Diocese of Sete Lagoas (erected)
26 April 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Itaguara, Piracema, and Desterro De Entre Bios) Diocese of Oliveira
11 July 1958Territory LostDiocese of Aterrado (Araujos and Perdigâo)
Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Divinópolis, Carmo de Caiurú, Claudio, Itapecerica, Itauna, Mateus Lerne, Nova Serrana, Para de Minas, Pitangui, São Gonçalo de Para, and Onça of Pequi)
Diocese of Divinópolis (erected)
11 November 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Povoado dos Lopes in Candeias) Diocese of Oliveira
11 November 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Cápela dos Alves in Bom Despacho) Diocese of Luz
11 November 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Sao José do Felipe and Santo Antonio do Morro Vermelho) Diocese of Sete Lagoas
11 November 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Belo Horizonte (Nossa Senhora da Conceiçâo, Conceiçâo do Rio Acima, and Santo Antonio de Vigario da Vara along with São Geraldo de Jacaranda and Nossa Senhora das Graças de Sesmaria) Archdiocese of Mariana
11 November 1963Territory AddedArchdiocese of Mariana (São José do Paraopeba in Brumadinho; Nossa Senhora da Conceiçâo de Arrojado Lisboa and Nossa Senhora do Parto de Chacrinha in Jeceaba) Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
11 November 1963Territory AddedDiocese of Sete Lagoas (Sant'Ana de Cachoeirinha and Nossa Senhora da Conceiçâo de Urucuia) Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
1950900,000.0%13590225098ap1951
1958794,209.0%108155263015596878ap1960
19651,200,0001,300,00092.3%1241682924,1092101,25097ap1967
19701,300,000.0%16627243803471,500106ap1971
19762,150,0002,400,00089.6%1452293745,7483241,400116ap1977
19802,070,0002,300,00090.0%1562073635,7023191,300135ap1981
19903,067,0003,407,00090.0%1942644586,6964751,130177ap1991
19992,950,7203,934,29475.0%2463275735,1497891,488219ap2000
20003,004,1624,005,54975.0%2653095745,2338201,497223ap2001
20013,149,8624,199,81675.0%2683175855,3847771,396242ap2002
20023,244,2314,325,64275.0%2552935485,9207951,508242ap2003
20033,290,3154,387,08775.0%2683085765,7128591,416252ap2004
20043,162,5394,216,71975.0%2752975725,5289201,332257ap2005
20063,535,7154,715,08375.0%3023076095,8059501,612258ap2007
20123,324,0004,748,00070.0%3583727304,55358221,378266ap2013
20153,406,0004,866,00070.0%3583717294,672338711,640273ap2016
20183,578,0005,110,67870.0%3682886565,45464668740277ap2019
20203,600,0005,142,93570.0%3763036795,301899501,493291ap2021
20223,653,8005,213,46370.1%3833257085,160122708511293ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 56, Page 265, to Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 24 Nov 2023