Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Geovane Luís da Silva

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Mons in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1971 Born
21 Jun 199726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Dec 201645.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Dec 201645.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia
25 Mar 201745.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Geovane Luís da Silva
Father Geovane Luís da Silva (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarandaí, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão João, Basilica, Barbacena

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 16 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017