Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walmor Oliveira de Azevedo

Archbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1954 BornCocos
9 Sep 197723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Jan 199843.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
21 Jan 199843.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
10 May 199844.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caliabria
28 Jan 200449.7AppointedArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Mar 200449.9InstalledArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Jul 201056.2AppointedBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites

MicroData Summary for Walmor Oliveira de Azevedo:
Archbishop Walmor Oliveira de Azevedo (born ) Archbishop of Belo Horizonte

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,276
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015