Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo Justino de Medeiros Silva

Coadjutor Archbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1966 Born
13 Dec 199225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Dec 201144.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Dec 201144.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
11 Feb 201245.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
22 Feb 201750.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joćo Justino de Medeiros Silva (VIAF: 284940806)
Archbishop Joćo Justino de Medeiros Silva (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Montes Claros

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuiz de Fora, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montes Claros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,256
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Feb 2017