Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Goiânia

Archidioecesis Goianiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Washington Cruz, C.P., Archbishop
  • Levi Bonatto, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Waldemar Passini Dalbello, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Antônio Ribeiro de Oliveira, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 26 March 1956
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,855 (5,351 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Web Site: http://www.catedralgo.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, C.P. 174, Praca Dom Emmanuel s/n, 74001-970 Goiania, GO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (062)3223-0759
  • Fax: 3223-8532

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 March 1956ErectedArchdiocese of Goiás Archdiocese of Goiânia (erected)
16 January 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia Diocese of Brasília (erected)
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia
Diocese of Goiás
Diocese of Jataí
Territorial Prelature of São Luís de Montes Belos (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia Diocese of Anápolis (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia Diocese of Ipameri (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia Diocese of Itumbiara (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966354,360.0%226991022ap1967
1970600,000650,00092.3%29841135,309210827434ap1971
1976600,000720,43783.3%30831135,30912226937ap1977
1980760,156894,30285.0%2375987,756611024038ap1981
19901,219,0001,437,00084.8%47871349,097317229259ap1991
19991,197,0001,663,21972.0%571061637,343221437859ap2000
20001,234,5001,714,65872.0%591191786,935222640861ap2001
20011,274,3001,769,93772.0%66851518,439119244261ap2002
20021,274,3001,769,73772.0%701001707,495322941362ap2003
20031,264,0001,887,00067.0%66941607,900320441764ap2004
20041,217,3001,850,00065.8%73961697,202424741766ap2005
20061,115,5501,850,00060.3%68991676,679425434668ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Oct 2014