Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Waldemar Passini Dalbello

Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1966 Born
3 Dec 199428.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
30 Dec 200943.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
30 Dec 200943.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Membressa
19 Mar 201043.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Membressa
10 Feb 201144.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
15 Jun 201145.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
3 Dec 201448.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
12 Jul 201751.0SucceededBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Waldemar Passini Dalbello
Bishop Waldemar Passini Dalbello (born ) Bishop of Luziânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnápolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luziânia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,590
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2014
  • s: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017