Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Guilherme (Thomas William) Murphy, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Juazeiro, Baia

Titular Bishop of Sululos

Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1917BornOmaha, NE, USA
2 Aug 193820.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Jun 194325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Oct 196244.8AppointedBishop of Juazeiro, Baia, Brazil
2 Jan 196345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Juazeiro, Baia, Brazil
29 Dec 197356.0ResignedBishop of Juazeiro, Baia, Brazil
29 Dec 197356.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
29 Dec 197356.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sululos
6 Jul 199577.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Juazeiro, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomás Guilherme (Thomas William) Murphy:
Bishop Tomás Guilherme (Thomas William) Murphy C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Juazeiro

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013