Catholic-Hierarchy DC

George William Cardinal Mundelein

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1872BornNew York
8 Jun 189522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
30 Jun 190937.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
30 Jun 190937.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
21 Sep 190937.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
9 Dec 191543.4AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Mar 192451.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 192451.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
2 Oct 193967.3DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for George William Mundelein:
Cardinal George William Mundelein (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 62
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013