Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Grady

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orlando, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1914BornChicago
23 Apr 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Jun 196752.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Jun 196752.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vamalla
24 Aug 196752.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vamalla
11 Nov 197460.1AppointedBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
16 Dec 197460.2InstalledBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
12 Dec 198975.2ResignedBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
21 Apr 200287.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Orlando, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Grady:
Bishop Thomas Joseph Grady (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orlando

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013