Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Peter Hillinger

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Derbe

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1904BornChicago
2 Apr 193227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Nov 195349.5AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
29 Dec 195349.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
14 Jan 195449.6InstalledBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
27 Jun 195652.1ResignedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
27 Jun 195652.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 Jun 195652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
13 Nov 197167.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond Peter Hillinger:
Bishop Raymond Peter Hillinger (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockford

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1972
  • ab/i/d: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015