Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest John Primeau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1909Born
7 Apr 193424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 Nov 195950.1AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
25 Feb 196050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
30 Jan 197464.3ResignedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
15 Jun 198979.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary
Ernest John Primeau
Bishop Ernest John Primeau
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Death PlaceManchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Buried Place (Original)Saint Joseph, Cemetery, Bedford, NH, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025