Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Dewey McNamara

Deceased

Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1898Born
23 Dec 192224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
17 Dec 194850.5AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
7 Mar 194950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
23 May 196668.0DiedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin Dewey McNamara
Bishop Martin Dewey McNamara (born , died ) Bishop of Joliet in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast