Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Samuel Alphonsus Cardinal Stritch

Deceased

Pro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1887BornNashville, TN
21 May 191022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
10 Aug 192134.0AppointedBishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
30 Nov 192134.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
26 Aug 193043.0AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
27 Dec 193952.4AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jan 194052.4InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Feb 194658.5Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194658.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
1 Mar 195870.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
27 May 195870.8DiedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Samuel Alphonsus Stritch:
Cardinal Samuel Alphonsus Stritch (born , died ) Pro-Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 25 Sep 2013