Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Daniel White

Deceased

Bishop of Spokane, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1879Born
24 Sep 191031.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192647.9AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
24 Feb 192748.1Ordained BishopBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
10 Mar 192748.1InstalledBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
25 Sep 195576.7DiedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Daniel White
Bishop Charles Daniel White (born , died ) Bishop of Spokane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand Rapids

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,927, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast