Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick Dougherty

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yakima, Washington

Titular Bishop of Altinum

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1905BornKansas City, KS
14 Jun 193025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
9 Jul 195146.5AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
26 Sep 195146.7Ordained BishopBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
11 Oct 195146.8InstalledBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
5 Feb 196964.1ResignedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
5 Feb 196964.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Altinum
16 Apr 196964.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
10 Jul 197065.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Yakima, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Dougherty:
Bishop Joseph Patrick Dougherty (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yakima

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013