Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Arthur Connolly

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1899BornSan Francisco
11 Jun 192626.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
10 Jun 193939.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
10 Jun 193939.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sila
24 Aug 193939.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sila
28 Feb 194848.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
21 Apr 194848.5InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
18 May 195050.6SucceededBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
23 Jun 195151.7AppointedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
26 Sep 195151.9InstalledArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
13 Feb 197575.3RetiredArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
18 Apr 199191.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Arthur Connolly:
Archbishop Thomas Arthur Connolly (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015