Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Augustine Corrigan

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1839BornNewark
19 Sep 186324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
14 Feb 187333.5AppointedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
4 May 187333.7Ordained BishopBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 Oct 188041.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of New York, New York, USA
1 Oct 188041.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
10 Oct 188546.2SucceededArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
5 May 190262.7DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Augustine Corrigan:
Archbishop Michael Augustine Corrigan (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 407, and Page 419
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013