Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William George McCloskey

Deceased

Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1823Born
6 Oct 185228.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
8 Dec 185936.0AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
3 Mar 186844.3AppointedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
24 May 186844.5Ordained BishopBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
17 Sep 190985.8DiedBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for William George McCloskey
Bishop William George McCloskey (born , died ) Bishop of Louisville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Umilta, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017