Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillus Paul Maes

Deceased

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1846Born
19 Dec 186822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
1 Oct 188438.5AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
25 Jan 188538.8Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
11 May 191569.1DiedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Camillus Paul Maes (VIAF: 283824179)
Bishop Camillus Paul Maes (born , died ) Bishop of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourtrai, Belgium
Ordained BishopCathedral, Covington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017