Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caspar Henry Borgess

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Phacusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1824BornAddrup, Germany
8 Dec 184824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
8 Feb 187045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
11 Feb 187045.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
24 Apr 187045.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
30 Dec 187147.4SucceededBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
16 Apr 188762.7ResignedBishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
14 Aug 188864.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
3 May 189065.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Caspar Henry Borgess:
Bishop Caspar Henry Borgess (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 450

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013