Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Horton Rosecrans

Deceased

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1827BornHomer, OH
1845¹17.9Converted
5 Jun 185326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
7 Jan 186234.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
7 Jan 186234.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
25 Mar 186235.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
3 Mar 186841.1AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
21 Oct 187851.7DiedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Horton Rosecrans:
Bishop Sylvester Horton Rosecrans (born , died ) Bishop of Columbus

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 216, and Page 462

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013