Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Aloysius Gallagher

Deceased

Bishop of Galveston, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1846Born
22 Dec 186822.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Columbus, Ohio, USA
25 Dec 186822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
8 Oct 187832.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Columbus, Ohio, USA
10 Jan 188235.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Galveston, Texas, USA
10 Jan 188235.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
30 Apr 188236.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
16 Dec 189246.8AppointedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
21 Jan 191871.9DiedBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Aloysius Gallagher
Bishop Nicholas Aloysius Gallagher (born , died ) Bishop of Galveston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTemperanceville, OH

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178, and Page 282
  • od/c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017