Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Durier

Deceased

Bishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1832Born
28 Oct 185624.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 188452.3AppointedBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
19 Mar 188552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
28 Feb 190471.5DiedBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Durier (VIAF: 317292538)
Bishop Anthony Durier (born , died ) Bishop of Natchitoches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Bonnet-des-Quarts, France
Ordained BishopSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017