Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Antonio

Archidioecesis Sancti Antonii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gustavo Garcia-Siller, M.Sp.S., Archbishop
  • Patrick Fernández Flores, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Thomas Joseph Flanagan, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Bernard Ferdinand Popp, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 August 1926
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 60,036 (27,841 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SAT
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archsa.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 2718 West Woodlawn Ave., P.O. Box 28410, San Antonio, TX 78228
  • Telephone: (210)734-2620
  • Fax: 734-0231

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Antonio
28 August 1874ErectedDiocese of Galveston Diocese of San Antonio (erected)
3 March 1914Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of El Paso (erected)
3 August 1926Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Amarillo (erected)
Archdiocese of San Antonio
3 August 1926ElevatedDiocese of San Antonio Archdiocese of San Antonio
15 November 1947Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Austin (erected)
13 April 1982Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Victoria in Texas (erected)
3 July 2000Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi (Webb, Zapata, Jim Hogg, and half of La Salle County)
Archdiocese of San Antonio (Maverick, Zavala, Dimmit and half of La Salle County)
Diocese of Laredo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of San Antonio
1950259,908725,00035.8%1331743078462611,070106ap1951
1966507,4391,222,58941.5%2142244381,1583551,193142ap1967
1970533,1191,288,12541.4%2042114151,2844121,749147ap1971
1976545,2661,301,50041.9%1902254151,313293621,590161ap1977
1980575,2451,376,07441.8%1802634431,298764341,500168ap1981
1990594,9061,663,70035.8%1442343781,5731934041,102184ap1991
1999673,0261,890,76035.6%1512223731,80425491939144ap2000
2000616,0001,802,00034.2%1752083831,608186341969136ap2001
2001679,7121,949,50634.9%1612574181,626284384919144ap2002
2002640,1861,906,51933.6%1621883501,829298310865138ap2003
2003644,3571,959,95032.9%1551963511,835312256834139ap2004
2004667,6671,979,73233.7%1671983651,829313313801139ap2005
2010702,5472,315,98830.3%1742954691,497352318726144ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013