Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Ferdinand Popp

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1917Born
24 Feb 194325.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
3 Jun 198365.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
3 Jun 198365.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
25 Jul 198365.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
23 Mar 199375.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Jun 201496.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Ferdinand Popp
Bishop Bernard Ferdinand Popp (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNada, TX
Ordained BishopS. Fernando, Cathedral, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

  • a priest for 71.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast