Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston

Archidioecesis Galvestoniensis Houstoniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Daniel Nicholas DiNardo, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • George Arthur Sheltz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Anthony Fiorenza, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Vincent Michael Rizzotto, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 December 2004
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 23,257 (9,354 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: GAL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diogh.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 1700 San Jacinto St., Houston, TX 77001-8216, USA
  • Telephone: (713)659-5461
  • Fax: 759-9151

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Texas
1839ErectedDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Prefecture Apostolic of Texas (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Texas
10 July 1841ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Texas Vicariate Apostolic of Texas (erected)
Diocese of Galveston
4 May 1847ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Texas Diocese of Galveston (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
19 July 1850Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Galveston (to New Orleans)
28 August 1874Territory LostDiocese of Galveston Diocese of San Antonio (erected)
28 August 1874Territory LostDiocese of Galveston Vicariate Apostolic of Brownsville (erected)
15 July 1890Territory LostDiocese of Galveston Diocese of Dallas (erected)
15 November 1947Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Austin (erected)
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
25 July 1959Name ChangedDiocese of Galveston Diocese of Galveston-Houston
25 June 1966Territory LostDiocese of Galveston-Houston Diocese of Beaumont (erected)
13 April 1982Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Victoria in Texas (erected)
12 December 1986Territory LostDiocese of Beaumont
Diocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
Diocese of Tyler (erected)
Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston
29 December 2004ElevatedDiocese of Galveston-Houston Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Texas
Vicariate Apostolic of Texas
Diocese of Galveston
190956,000532982682637582ce
1950205,1481,505,60213.6%1221032259114285092ap1951
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
1966386,3952,931,00013.2%1661883541,0911101,200104ap1967
1970301,6472,250,00013.4%161196357844216760111ap1971
1976362,5112,660,00013.6%15622237895980258500128ap1977
1980437,1702,960,00014.8%1851852,36310622649157ap1981
1990646,0003,741,00017.3%2072484551,419183277607160ap1991
1999906,3304,396,87620.6%1952184132,19425618508151ap2000
2000908,1904,442,23020.4%2162214372,078292261518151ap2001
2001951,3604,528,00521.0%2192204392,167297256498151ap2002
2002974,3124,704,53220.7%2172264432,199300257503150ap2003
20031,006,4254,704,53221.4%2152234382,297250244482150ap2004
Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston
20041,041,1234,972,54420.9%2162214372,382362254499150ap2005
20061,045,0305,250,98419.9%2192224412,369357254523149ap2007
20091,128,0655,572,08720.2%2242184422,552390242471149ap2010
20121,170,4036,099,52419.2%2272144412,653402238449146ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014