Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Dufal, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Galveston, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1822Born
20 Jan 185229.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
29 Sep 185229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
3 Jul 186037.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Bengal, India
3 Jul 186037.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
25 Nov 186038.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
25 Aug 186643.7AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Holy Cross
19 Jul 186845.6ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Holy Cross
28 Jul 187653.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Bengal, India
14 May 187855.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
6 Dec 187957.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
14 Mar 189875.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Galveston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Dufal
Bishop Peter Dufal C.S.C. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Galveston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Gervais d'Auvergne, France
Ordained BishopSte Croix, Le Mans, Diocese of Le Mans, France

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 241, and Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017