Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Théophile Pallu (Palluc) du Parc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Blois, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1804Born
22 Dec 182723.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle, France
3 Jan 185146.3SelectedBishop of Blois, France
17 Feb 185146.4ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
1 May 185146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
13 Jan 187772.3ResignedBishop of Blois, France
31 Mar 187772.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Théophile Pallu (Palluc) du Parc (VIAF: 24590027)
Bishop Louis-Théophile Pallu (Palluc) du Parc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoitiers
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Rochelle, Diocese of La Rochelle

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017