Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Anne Nogret

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1798Born
21 Dec 182224.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 186263.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
7 Apr 186263.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
30 Jun 186263.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
29 Jan 188081.3RetiredBishop of Saint-Claude, France
9 Jan 188485.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Anne Nogret (VIAF: 89234457)
Bishop Louis-Anne Nogret (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJosselin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017